This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/14/2024 at 06:00:15 (UTC).

Unifund CCR, LLC vs Marilyn M. Gutierrez

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 Unifund CCR, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Marilyn M Gutierrez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Court Documents

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Unifund CCR, LLC.

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Unifund CCR, LLC.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Marilyn M. Gutierrez served on 03/30/2023 by Substituted Service. $70.00.

CM180 Notice of Stay of Proceedings

Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by Unifund CCR, LLC.

Notice of Hearing

06/12/2023: Notice of Hearing

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Unifund CCR, LLC, Marilyn M. Gutierrez Entered.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (BB)

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/11/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.

 

Docket Entries

12/11/2023

HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Blanca Banuelos; Participants; Marilyn M. Gutierrez (Defendant); Unifund CCR, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketHearing Result: Reassigned; Judge: Banuelos, Blanca

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Unifund CCR, LLC, Marilyn M. Gutierrez Entered.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Unifund CCR, LLC.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/11/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by Unifund CCR, LLC.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketCase status updated to All Proceedings Stayed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Marilyn M. Gutierrez served on 03/30/2023 by Substituted Service. $70.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Unifund CCR, LLC.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Unifund CCR, LLC.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022

DocketPayment received by LLC Unifund CCR in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 766802.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022

DocketAttorney, John P Kenosian, retained for Unifund CCR, LLC .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

Search Court Records