This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/07/2017 at 09:08:23 (UTC).

FABIO G GIOTTA VS. CAFFE TRIESTE, INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 FABIO G GIOTTA filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against CAFFE TRIESTE, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN, TERI L. JACKSON and A. JAMES ROBERTSON II. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9705

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

TERI L. JACKSON

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GIOTTA, FABIO G

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

Cross Defendants and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

GIOTTA, ADRIENNE INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE GIOTTA FAMILY TRUST

CAFFE TRIESTE, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ZOUBI, IDA

CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CAFFE TRIESTE, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

SCARPINO, JOHN H

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOHN SCARPINO

44 Montgomery St. S-2500

San Francisco, CA 94104-4217

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LIPPENBERGER, DON CARL

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF CARL LIPPENBERGERSHELTERPOINT BUSINESS CENTER

591 Redwood Highway Suite 2375

Mill Valley, CA 94941

KENNY, DENIS S.

Attorney at SCHERER SMITH & KENNY LLP

140 Geary Street, 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Denis S Kenny in support of defendants caffe trieste in

DECLARATION OF DENIS S KENNY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 100027576) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAFFE TRIESTE, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ZOUBI, IDA

Defendants Caffe Trieste Inc Caffe Trieste Superb Coffees Inc and Ida

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 100027576) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAFFE TRIESTE, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ZOUBI, IDA

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-15-2018 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

Proof of Service of Motion to Disqualify Counsel

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FEDERAL EXPRESS OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 17323047) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GIOTTA, FABIO G

Declaration of John Scarpino in Support of Motion to Disqualify Counse

DECLARATION OF JOHN SCARPINO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 17323047) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GIOTTA, FABIO G

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Disqualif

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 17323047) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GIOTTA, FABIO G

Notice of Motion to Disqualify Counsel

NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 17323047) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GIOTTA, FABIO G HEARING SET FOR DEC-18-2017 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

Objection to Notice of Time and Place of Trial

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100026181) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ZOUBI, IDA

Plaintiffs Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 17312074) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GIOTTA, FABIO G JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 9.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAY-29-2018 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON NOV-22-2017 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61335140) FILED BY DEFENDANT GIOTTA, ADRIENNE INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE GIOTTA FAMILY TRUST JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 9.0 DAYS

Caffe Trieste, Inc., Caffe Triest Superb Coffees, Inc. and Ida Zoubis

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100025851) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAFFE TRIESTE, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ZOUBI, IDA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 9.0 DAYS

Answer to Cross-Complaint

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17299026) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT GIOTTA, FABIO G

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CAFFE TRIESTE, INC, CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC AS TO THE FIFTH CAUSE OF ACTION (INTENTIONAL MISREPRESENTATION) AND SIXTH CAUSE OF ACTION (NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION) ONLY (TRANSACTION ID # 100024848)

Declaration of John H Scarpino in Support of Thirty-Day Continuance of

DECLARATION OF JOHN H SCARPINO IN SUPPORT OF THIRTY-DAY CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRER DEADLINE (C.C.P. SECT. 430.41) (TRANSACTION ID # 17283076) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GIOTTA, FABIO G

Answer to Complaint for 1. Involuntary Dissolution of a California Cor

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61019877) FILED BY DEFENDANT GIOTTA, ADRIENNE INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE GIOTTA FAMILY TRUST

Cross-Complaint of Caffe Trieste, Inc. and Caffe Trieste Superb Coffee

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100021259) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT CAFFE TRIESTE, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT GIOTTA, FABIO G DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

Verified Answer of Caffe Trieste, Inc.; Caffe Trieste Superb Coffees,

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100021259) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAFFE TRIESTE, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ZOUBI, IDA

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2017
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1417B21R008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1417B21M007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R3417B08J003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : Y0217822F003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1350; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : Y0217822F002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number : R7717622F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DENIS S KENNY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 100027576) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAFFE TRIESTE, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ZOUBI, IDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 100027576) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAFFE TRIESTE, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ZOUBI, IDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-15-2018 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • OBJECTION HEARING OF NOV-22-2017 HELD. JUDGE: A. JAMES ROBERTSON; CLERK: YOLANDA MAZARIEGOS/KENNETH HUNT; PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (610)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2017
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100025851) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100025851) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAFFE TRIESTE, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ZOUBI, IDA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 9.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17299026) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT GIOTTA, FABIO G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CAFFE TRIESTE, INC, CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC AS TO THE FIFTH CAUSE OF ACTION (INTENTIONAL MISREPRESENTATION) AND SIXTH CAUSE OF ACTION (NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION) ONLY (TRANSACTION ID # 100024848)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JOHN H SCARPINO IN SUPPORT OF THIRTY-DAY CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRER DEADLINE (C.C.P. SECT. 430.41) (TRANSACTION ID # 17283076) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GIOTTA, FABIO G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61019877) FILED BY DEFENDANT GIOTTA, ADRIENNE INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE GIOTTA FAMILY TRUST (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100021259) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT CAFFE TRIESTE, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT GIOTTA, FABIO G DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100021259) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAFFE TRIESTE, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ZOUBI, IDA (Fee:$1350.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PARTNERSHIP AND CORPORATE GOVERNANCE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GIOTTA, FABIO G AS TO DEFENDANT CAFFE TRIESTE, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CAFE TRIESTE SUPERB COFFEES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION GIOTTA, ADRIENNE INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE GIOTTA FAMILY TRUST ZOUBI, IDA DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-22-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-21-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-30-2017 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******9705
Case Title:FABIO G GIOTTA VS. CAFFE TRIESTE, INC ET AL
Court Date:DEC-21-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion By Plaintiff Fabio G. Giotta To Strike Or Tax Costs Of Defendant Ida Zoubi
Rulings:Set for hearing on Friday, December 21, 2018, Line 7, PLAINTIFF FABIO GIOTTA Motion By Plaintiff Fabio G. Giotta To Strike Or Tax Costs Of Defendant Ida ZoubiIf the tentative ruling is contested, the motion will be heard at 10:30am, not 9:30am, by Judge Kahn. Plaintiff Fabio Giotta's motion to strike or tax costs claimed by defendant Ida Zoubi is granted in part. Ms. Zoubi is entitled to costs in the amount of $4,006.54. Ms. Zoubi's opposition papers included a revised costs memorandum. All costs claimed in the original costs memorandum not included in the revised memorandum are taxed based on Ms. Zoubi's concession that she should not recover those costs. In addition, the court taxes two-thirds of the costs for Mr. Giotta's deposition since those costs are properly equally allocable among all three of the clients represented by the Schrerer firm. All other costs claimed on the revised memorandum were reasonably incurred and recoverable by Ms. Zoubi. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. Counsel for Ms. Zoubi is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring it to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. =302/rbu


Case Number:*******9705
Case Title:FABIO G GIOTTA VS. CAFFE TRIESTE, INC ET AL
Court Date:OCT-01-2018 10:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Defendants Caffe Trieste, Inc., Caffe Trieste Superb Coffees, Inc., And Ida Zoubi'S Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summary Adjudication Or Both. (Continued From 9/27/18)
Rulings:Set for hearing on Monday, October 1, 2018, Line 15, Defendants Caffe Trieste, Inc., Caffe Trieste Superb Coffees, Inc., And Ida Zoubi'S Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summary Adjudication Or Both. (Continued From 9/27/18)Hearing required. The hearing will be at 10:30am, not 9:30am. =302/hk


Case Number:*******9705
Case Title:FABIO G GIOTTA VS. CAFFE TRIESTE, INC ET AL
Court Date:SEP-27-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Defendant Giotta'S Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, September 27, 2018, Line 15, Defendant Giotta's Motion For Judgment On The PleadingsHearing required. =302/hk


Case Number:*******9705
Case Title:FABIO G GIOTTA VS. CAFFE TRIESTE, INC ET AL
Court Date:SEP-13-2018 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Or Summary Adjudication Or Both
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, September 13, 2018, Line 2, DEFENDANT ADRIENNE GIOTTA's MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Or Summary Adjudication Or BothDefendant Giotta's motion for summary judgment is CONTINUED to September 28, 2018 due to the late filed opposition. Defendant to file and serve any reply papers by September 21, 2018. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4 pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. =302/acm


Case Number:*******9705
Case Title:FABIO G GIOTTA VS. CAFFE TRIESTE, INC ET AL
Court Date:DEC-18-2017 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion To Disqualify Counsel
Rulings:Set for hearing on Monday, December 18, 2017, Line 13,PLAINTIFF FABIO GIOTTA's Motion To Disqualify CounselPlaintiff Fabio Giotta's motion to disqualify the law firm of Scherer Smith & Kenny from representing both the corporate defendants and defendant Ida Zoubi in this case is denied. Mr. Giotta has not alleged a derivative claim, made allegations that are "essentially derivative in nature," or otherwise identified an actual conflict between the corporate defendants and Ms. Zoubi. (Coldren v. Hart, King & Coldren, Inc. (2015) 239 Cal. App. 4th 237). This motion is controlled by Coldren and must be denied for the same two reasons that Coldren reversed a trial court's grant of a motion to disqualify the law firm in that case: 1) Mr. Giotta lacks standing to challenge the alleged conflict and 2) no conflict has been shown. The fact that, unlike Coldren, there has been no Corporations Code 2000 buyout demand in this case does not make Coldren inapplicable to this case. The discussion in Coldren about the section 2000 demand was corroboratory to the holding that, absent a derivative claim or derivative-like allegation, there is no conflict precluding a law firm from representing both a controlling shareholder and the corporation. Gong v. RFG Oil, Inc. (2008) 166 Cal. App. 4th 209, relied on by Mr. Giotta, is not applicable, as stated in Coldren, because Mr. Giotta has not alleged either a derivative claim or made allegations that are "essentially derivative in nature." Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. Counsel for Ms. Zoubi is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring it to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested.=(302/HK)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenny, Denis S