This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 10:47:18 (UTC).

Williams VS Garcia Cervantes

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Garcia Cervantes. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Williams, Kenneth

Defendant

Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cutting, Stacey R

Zavidow, Robert M

Defendant Attorney

Turtzo, Christopher

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Williams, Kenneth. Refers to: Garcia Cervantes, Roberto

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Williams, Kenneth. Refers to: Garcia Cervantes, Roberto

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Williams, Kenneth. Refers to: Garcia Cervantes, Roberto

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Williams, Kenneth. Refers to: Garcia Cervantes, Roberto

Roberto E. Garcia Cervantes' Answer

Answer filed by Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E.

Association of Attorney

Association of Attorney filed by Williams, Kenneth.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Williams, Kenneth.

Defendant's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service filed by Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E.; Filed By: Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E.; Filed By: Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service filed by Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E.; Filed By: Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement filed by Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E.; Filed By: Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement filed by Williams, Kenneth.; Filed By: Williams, Kenneth (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAssociation of Attorney filed by Williams, Kenneth.; Filed By: Williams, Kenneth (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service filed by Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E.; Filed By: Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer filed by Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E.; Filed By: Garcia Cervantes, Roberto E (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Williams, Kenneth. Refers to: Garcia Cervantes, Roberto; Filed By: Williams, Kenneth (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

08/08/2022

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022

DocketSummons issued.

08/05/2022

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Williams, Kenneth. Refers to: Garcia Cervantes, Roberto; Filed By: Williams, Kenneth (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Williams, Kenneth. Refers to: Garcia Cervantes, Roberto; Filed By: Williams, Kenneth (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by Williams, Kenneth. Refers to: Garcia Cervantes, Roberto; Filed By: Williams, Kenneth (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records