This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/17/2019 at 10:54:53 (UTC).

Tranquil Home Personnel Service vs. Brad Stewart

Case Summary

On 01/11/2018 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Tranquil Home Personnel Service against Brad Stewart in the jurisdiction of San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse :

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRANQUIL HOME PERSONNEL SERVICE

Defendant

STEWART, BRAD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 08/09/2018 01:00:00 PM.

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Tranquil Home Personnel Service. Refers to: Stewart, Brad

Declaration of Non Military Status (Small Claims)

Declaration of Non Military Status (Small Claims) filed by Tranquil Home Personnel Service. Refers to: Stewart, Brad

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from C-22 to C-62 effective 01/12/2018.

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Tranquil Home Personnel Service. Refers to: Stewart, Brad

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

08/09/2018
View Court Documents

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 08/09/2018 01:00:00 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2018

Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2018
View Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2018

Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 08/09/2018 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-63 .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2018

The Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 08/09/2018 at 01:00:00 PM in C-63 before at Central.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2018
View Court Documents

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

04/24/2018
View Court Documents

Declaration of Non Military Status (Small Claims) filed by Tranquil Home Personnel Service. Refers to: Stewart, Brad Filed By: Tranquil Home Personnel Service (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2018
View Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Tranquil Home Personnel Service. Refers to: Stewart, Brad Filed By: Tranquil Home Personnel Service (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2018

Case reassigned from C-62 to C-63 effective 04/14/2018.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2018

Small Claims Court Trial reassigned to for 04/24/2018 at 08:00:00 AM in C-63 at Central.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2018
View Court Documents

Case reassigned from C-22 to C-62 effective 01/12/2018.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2018

Small Claims Court Trial reassigned to for 04/24/2018 at 08:00:00 AM in C-62 at Central.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2018
View Court Documents

Case initiation form printed.

01/11/2018

Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 04/24/2018 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-22 .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2018

Case assigned to Department C-22.

01/11/2018
View Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Tranquil Home Personnel Service. Refers to: Stewart, Brad Filed By: Tranquil Home Personnel Service (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records