This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 08:00:05 (UTC).

Pellegrini vs Muntifering Kakehashi

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 Pellegrini filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Muntifering Kakehashi. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pellegrini, Thomas

Defendant

Muntifering Kakehashi, Brenda

Guardian Ad Litem

Pellegrini, Kristine Louise Kahrs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

Hepburn, Adam

Defendant Attorney

Rogers, Heather

 

Court Documents

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement filed by PLOTKIN, BARRY M.

Mediator Selection Form

Mediator Selection Form filed by Muntifering Kakehashi, Brenda.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/30/2022 10:00:00 AM.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Muntifering Kakehashi, Brenda.

Plaintiffs Notice of Remote Appearance

Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Pellegrini, Thomas.

Plaintiffs Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Pellegrini, Thomas.

Plaintiffs Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Pellegrini, Thomas.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Muntifering Kakehashi, Brenda.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Muntifering Kakehashi, Brenda.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pellegrini, Thomas. Refers to: Muntifering Kakehashi, Brenda

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Pellegrini, Thomas.

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Pellegrini, Thomas. Refers to: Pellegrini, Kristine

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketStatus of Mediation process changed to Settled at hearing.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement filed by PLOTKIN, BARRY M.; Filed By: PLOTKIN, BARRY M (Mediator)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022

DocketStatus of Mediation process changed to Pending mediation.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMediator Selection Form filed by Muntifering Kakehashi, Brenda.; Filed By: Muntifering Kakehashi, Brenda (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/30/2022 10:00:00 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2022

DocketThis matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2022

DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 09:00AM before Judge Richard S. Whitney.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
04/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Pellegrini, Thomas.; Filed By: Pellegrini, Thomas (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Pellegrini, Thomas. Refers to: Pellegrini, Kristine; Filed By: Pellegrini, Thomas (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

04/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

04/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

04/15/2022

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pellegrini, Thomas. Refers to: Muntifering Kakehashi, Brenda; Filed By: Pellegrini, Thomas (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by Pellegrini, Thomas. Refers to: Muntifering Kakehashi, Brenda; Filed By: Pellegrini, Thomas (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records