This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/01/2023 at 07:54:23 (UTC).

ISERLOTH vs SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ENCINITAS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2023 ISERLOTH filed a Malpractice - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ENCINITAS. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Open.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Open

  • Case Type:

    Malpractice - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Judge

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Iserloth, Steffen

Defendants

SCRIPPS HEALTH; DBA : Scripps Memorial Hospital Encinitas;ESA : Scripps Memorial Hospital Encinitas

Schale, M.D., Stephen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Walkon, Bradley J

Defendant Attorney

Becker, Courtney S

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Iserloth, Steffen. Refers to: SCRIPPS HEALTH; Schale, M.D., Stephen

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Iserloth, Steffen. Refers to: SCRIPPS HEALTH; Schale, M.D., Stephen

Summons

Original Summons filed by Iserloth, Steffen. Refers to: SCRIPPS HEALTH; Schale, M.D., Stephen

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by SCRIPPS HEALTH.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other filed by SCRIPPS HEALTH.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by SCRIPPS HEALTH.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (OF TRIAL COUNSEL) filed by SCRIPPS HEALTH.

Demand for Jury Trial (Trial/Hearing Setting)

Demand for Jury Trial filed by SCRIPPS HEALTH.

 

Docket Entries

12/15/2023

HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by SCRIPPS HEALTH.; Filed By: SCRIPPS HEALTH (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration - Other (OF TRIAL COUNSEL) filed by SCRIPPS HEALTH.; Filed By: SCRIPPS HEALTH (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by SCRIPPS HEALTH.; Filed By: SCRIPPS HEALTH (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration - Other filed by SCRIPPS HEALTH.; Filed By: SCRIPPS HEALTH (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer filed by SCRIPPS HEALTH.; Filed By: SCRIPPS HEALTH (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

07/13/2023

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/15/2023 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketSummons issued.

07/11/2023

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Iserloth, Steffen. Refers to: SCRIPPS HEALTH; Schale, M.D., Stephen; Filed By: Iserloth, Steffen (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Iserloth, Steffen. Refers to: SCRIPPS HEALTH; Schale, M.D., Stephen; Filed By: Iserloth, Steffen (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by Iserloth, Steffen. Refers to: SCRIPPS HEALTH; Schale, M.D., Stephen; Filed By: Iserloth, Steffen (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records