This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/10/2024 at 14:38:20 (UTC).

R.C. v. The Superior Court of Butte County

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 R C filed a Civil lawsuit against The Superior Court of Butte County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mosbarger, Tamara. The case status is Open.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Open

  • Case Type:

    Civil

  • State:

    California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mosbarger, Tamara

 

Party Details

Petitioner

R. C.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Butte County

Real Party In Interest

The People

Unknown

Butte County District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Mi K. Kim

Ronald A. Reed

Real Party In Interest Attorney

Office of the State Attorney General

Unknown Attorney

D. Marc Noel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/29/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review is denied. Cantil-Sakauye, C.J. (Received 12/30/21)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2021

DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: Petitioner's (S271865).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021

DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate is denied. Hull, Acting P.J., Murray, J., Krause, J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021

DocketDescription: Case complete.

11/15/2021

DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate is denied. Hull, Acting P.J., Murray, J., Krause, J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2021

DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: petition for writ of mandate. 5 vols. (936 pgs.) Filed with deficiencies.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2021

DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: mandate.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records