This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 04:23:44 (UTC).

JOHNSON & MUJAHIDH

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 JOHNSON MUJAHIDH was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse :

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KIMBERLY JOHNSON

Respondents

WALLI MUJAHIDH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

12/01/2021

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Petition or other first paper (including a joint petition) for dissolution of marriage or domestic partnership, legal separation, or nullity (GC70670B); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/01/2021; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: 20211201-00398.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Failure to Bring Case to Trial or Judgment; Expiration Date: 11/30/2026; Status: Active

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non Proof of Service of Summons and Petition; Expiration Date: 11/30/2024; Status: Active

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Schedule a Case Status Conference; Expiration Date: 12/01/2022; Status: Active

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Case Management Date: Proof of Service; Expiration Date: 01/30/2022; Status: Active

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Family Law Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: KIMBERLY JOHNSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036); Filed By: KIMBERLY JOHNSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage FL-100 FL-142 attached; Filed By: KIMBERLY JOHNSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by KIMBERLY JOHNSON; Filed By: KIMBERLY JOHNSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) on Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by KIMBERLY JOHNSON; Filed By: KIMBERLY JOHNSON; Confidential: YES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Income and Expense Declaration (FL-150); Filed By: KIMBERLY JOHNSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Confidential Contact Information (RI-FL011); Filed By: KIMBERLY JOHNSON; Confidential: YES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021

DocketFilings: Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by KIMBERLY JOHNSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records