This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/26/2023 at 20:20:15 (UTC).

Dejesus, Pedro Valdes, Dejesus, Pedro Valdez Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 Dejesus, Pedro Valdes, Dejesus, Pedro Valdez was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Valdesdejesus, Pedro

Dejesus, Pedro Valdez

Valdes-Dejesus, Pedro

Dejesus, Pedro Valdes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Shaaban, Alexander

Hudson, Jeremy

Lutz, Ernest

Lopez, Elena

Stocks, Maria

Banuelos, Veronica

Chupurdy, Dustin

Mayorga, Cristina

Poladian-Melzer, Lisa

Feccia, Stephanie

DeBonis, Ariel

Swensson, Mark J.

Zamora, Adam

Briante, Michael

Spires, Patrick

Le, Jessica

Zykanova, Anastasia

Kim, Lori

Rojas, Mayra

Bader, Alliah Sue

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/25/2022

SentenceSent Seq #: 1; Type: INFORMAL; Term: 3 years; Status; History; Status: Active; Status Date: 03/26/2019; End Date: 03/25/2022; History; Status: Expired; Status Date: 03/25/2022; End Date: 03/25/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Chambers Work -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2019

SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: Statement of Assets

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2019

SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: Restitution

03/26/2019

SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: Batterers' Treatment Program

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2019

SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: 8 hours Community Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2019

SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: 3 years Probation

02/04/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Warrant Hold; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
05/17/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Motion Discovery; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W15; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W15; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W15; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W15; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W15; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2018

BondDetails; Detail; Action: Active; Action Date: 02/14/2018; Amount: $50,000.00; Detail; Action: Exonerated; Action Date: 03/26/2019; Amount: $50,000.00; Bail Date: 02/14/2018; Post Amount: 02/14/2018; Bondsman: $50,000.00; Surety: Don's Bail Bonds

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2018

DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/09/2018; Section Statute: 243(e)(1) PC; OL: M; Violation: Battery; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 03/26/2019; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 03/26/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records