This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/31/2023 at 18:43:57 (UTC).

Ceja Chau, Michelle Clarisse, Cejachau, Michelle Clarisse Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 Ceja Chau, Michelle Clarisse, Cejachau, Michelle Clarisse was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Ceja Chau, Michelle Clarisse

Cejachau, Michelle Clarisse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wah, Kimberly A

Briante, Michael

Feccia, Stephanie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/10/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2018

DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/09/2018; Section Statute: 25658(a) BP; OL: M; Violation: Furnish/sell alcohol to a minor; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 04/18/2018; Disposition: Dismissed; Dispo Date: 07/10/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records