This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 14:18:50 (UTC).

George, Mariam Hanna, Hanna, Maream Talat Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 George, Mariam Hanna, Hanna, Maream Talat was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

George, Mariam Hanna

Hanna, Maream Talat

Hanna, Mariam Talat

Hanna, Mariam Telat

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Glass, Christopher Sean

Cope-Vega, Bethel

Le, Rosalynn

Brown, Alexander J.

Shaaban, Alexander

Rice, Dustin

Schug, Andrea

Chupurdy, Dustin

Nagrath, Neha

Feccia, Stephanie

Soares, Jennifer

Wynn, Justin

Micheil, Bonnie Nicole

Briante, Michael

Spires, Patrick

Deputy Public Defender,

Gully, Gerard

Learned, Catherine

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/14/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Failure to Appear; Courtroom: W10; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Failure to Appear; Courtroom: W10; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Failure to Appear; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Cancel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Cancel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Cancel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Jury Trial -; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Cancel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
05/18/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Cancel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Jury Trial -; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Cancel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W17; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W17; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Cancel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: W18; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2018

BondDetails; Detail; Action: Active; Action Date: 04/20/2018; Amount: $15,000.00; Detail; Action: Exonerated; Action Date: 08/26/2021; Amount: $15,000.00; Bail Date: 04/20/2018; Post Amount: 04/20/2018; Bondsman: $15,000.00; Surety: Bail Bond Professionals

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2018

DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/09/2018; Section Statute: 273.6(a) PC; OL: M; Violation: Disobeying domestic relations court order; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 04/19/2018; Disposition: Dismissed; Dispo Date: 08/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records