This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/02/2023 at 11:00:06 (UTC).

Aguilar, Anthony

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 Aguilar, Anthony was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

Aguilar, Anthony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Flory, Mike

Spires, Patrick

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/17/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Cancel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2019

SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: 40 days Jail

08/16/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Chambers Work -; Courtroom: W3; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Sentencing Modification; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2019

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Sentencing Modification; Courtroom: W3; Hearing Status: Cancel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Cancel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2018

SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: 30 days Cal Trans/Physical Labor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2018

HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: W4; Hearing Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2018

DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 02/09/2018; Section Statute: 11377(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of a controlled substance; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 04/16/2018; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 04/16/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records