This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/19/2023 at 06:22:21 (UTC).

VANESSA ALLEM-LOEB VS. DAVID ERNEST BOTTINO

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 VANESSA ALLEM-LOEB filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID ERNEST BOTTINO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Allen Jay Loeb

Vanessa Allem-Loeb

Defendant

David Ernest Bottino

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Razavi Law Group, APC

Defendant Attorney

Law Offices of Cullins & Grandy LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13091468 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12919458.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13091468 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12919458.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLEM-LOEB, VANESSA; LOEB, ALLEN JAY ON 08/12/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLEM-LOEB, VANESSA; LOEB, ALLEN JAY ON 08/12/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLEM-LOEB, VANESSA; LOEB, ALLEN JAY ON 08/12/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLEM-LOEB, VANESSA; LOEB, ALLEN JAY ON 08/12/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LOEB, ALLEN JAY; ALLEM-LOEB, VANESSA ON 08/16/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LOEB, ALLEN JAY; ALLEM-LOEB, VANESSA ON 08/16/2022

CASE REASSIGNED TO ERICK LARSH EFFECTIVE 11/01/2022.

CASE REASSIGNED TO ERICK LARSH EFFECTIVE 11/01/2022.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BOTTINO, DAVID ERNEST ON 10/14/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BOTTINO, DAVID ERNEST ON 10/14/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY BOTTINO, DAVID ERNEST ON 10/14/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY BOTTINO, DAVID ERNEST ON 10/14/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13124185 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12952250.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13124185 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12952250.

CASE REASSIGNED TO SHEILA RECIO EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

CASE REASSIGNED TO SHEILA RECIO EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BOTTINO, DAVID ERNEST ON 12/30/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BOTTINO, DAVID ERNEST ON 12/30/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LOEB, ALLEN JAY; ALLEM-LOEB, VANESSA ON 01/03/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LOEB, ALLEN JAY; ALLEM-LOEB, VANESSA ON 01/03/2023

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LOEB, ALLEN JAY; ALLEM-LOEB, VANESSA ON 01/03/2023

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LOEB, ALLEN JAY; ALLEM-LOEB, VANESSA ON 01/03/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13158541 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12986638.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13158541 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12986638.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/30/2023

HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: RECIO; Department: W08

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/30/2023 AT 10:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER ON 01/30/2023 AT 10:00:00 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13158541 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12986638.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21253840 RECEIVED ON 01/02/2023 05:07:15 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LOEB, ALLEN JAY; ALLEM-LOEB, VANESSA ON 01/03/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LOEB, ALLEN JAY; ALLEM-LOEB, VANESSA ON 01/03/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41429555 RECEIVED ON 01/02/2023 05:07:15 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BOTTINO, DAVID ERNEST ON 12/30/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
10/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BOTTINO, DAVID ERNEST ON 10/14/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO ERICK LARSH EFFECTIVE 11/01/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31194341 RECEIVED ON 08/16/2022 09:27:54 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LOEB, ALLEN JAY; ALLEM-LOEB, VANESSA ON 08/16/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13091468 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12919458.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21195544 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2022 10:14:44 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HURWITZ, LON ON 08/12/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLEM-LOEB, VANESSA; LOEB, ALLEN JAY ON 08/12/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ALLEM-LOEB, VANESSA; LOEB, ALLEN JAY ON 08/12/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records