This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/25/2022 at 04:44:59 (UTC).

RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED VS. THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RBD California Restaurants Limited

Defendant

The Irvine Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ervin Cohen & Jessup LLP

Defendant Attorney

Bewley, Lassleben & Miller, LLP

 

Court Documents

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/21/2022

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/21/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/29/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/29/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE - OTHER (OF TRANSFER) FILED BY RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED ON 06/09/2022

NOTICE - OTHER (OF TRANSFER) FILED BY RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED ON 06/09/2022

COMPLAINT (3/15/2022) FILED BY RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED ON 06/01/2022

COMPLAINT (3/15/2022) FILED BY RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED ON 06/01/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (03/15/2022) FILED BY RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED ON 06/01/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (03/15/2022) FILED BY RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED ON 06/01/2022

COURT DOCUMENT (NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT [03/15/2022]) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2022

COURT DOCUMENT (NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT [03/15/2022]) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2022

COURT DOCUMENT (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [03/15/2022]) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2022

COURT DOCUMENT (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [03/15/2022]) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (03/16/2022) FILED BY RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED ON 06/01/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (03/16/2022) FILED BY RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED ON 06/01/2022

COURT DOCUMENT (NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2022

COURT DOCUMENT (NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2022

NOTICE - OTHER (RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [04/11/2022]) FILED BY RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED ON 06/01/2022

NOTICE - OTHER (RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [04/11/2022]) FILED BY RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED ON 06/01/2022

MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE (04/28/2022) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/01/2022

MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE (04/28/2022) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/01/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (04/28/2022) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/01/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (04/28/2022) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/01/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (04/28/2022) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/01/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (04/28/2022) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/01/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (04/28/2022) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/01/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (04/28/2022) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/01/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE (04/28/2022) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/01/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE (04/28/2022) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/01/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (04/28/2022) RECEIVED ON 06/01/2022.

PROPOSED ORDER (04/28/2022) RECEIVED ON 06/01/2022.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (05/11/2022) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/01/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER (05/11/2022) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/01/2022

COURT DOCUMENT (MINUTE ORDER [05/16/2022]) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2022

COURT DOCUMENT (MINUTE ORDER [05/16/2022]) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2022

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SERVINO; Department: C21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/29/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31171405 RECEIVED ON 06/21/2022 11:18:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31167074 RECEIVED ON 06/09/2022 01:20:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (OF TRANSFER) FILED BY RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED ON 06/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ERVIN COHEN & JESSUP LLP FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13058355 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12886371.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT DOCUMENT (RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT DOCUMENT (NOTICE OF TRANSFER RECLASSIFICATION AND/OR CONSOLIDATION) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (04/28/2022) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER (04/28/2022) RECEIVED ON 06/01/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER (05/11/2022) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 06/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT DOCUMENT (MINUTE ORDER [05/16/2022]) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT DOCUMENT (CERTIFICATE OF MAILING) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (05/20/2022) FILED BY RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED ON 06/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT DOCUMENT (CERTIFICATE OF MAILING) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT DOCUMENT (CERTIFICATE OF MAILING) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT DOCUMENT (REGISTER OF ACTIONS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 06/01/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RBD CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTS LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where The Irvine Company, LLC is a litigant