This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/07/2017 at 11:38:03 (UTC).

PARK NEWPORT, LTD VS. CODAWN CONSULTING CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/15/2011 PARK NEWPORT, LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CODAWN CONSULTING CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse :

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK NEWPORT, LTD

Defendant

CODAWN CONSULTING CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN, LLP

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 05/13/2011

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 05/13/2011

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CODAWN CONSULTING CORPORATION ON 03/21/2011

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CODAWN CONSULTING CORPORATION ON 03/21/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10906806 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10730698.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10906806 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10730698.

DECLARATION OF DEFAULT/NON-COMPLIANCE (ORDER) FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 05/13/2011

DECLARATION OF DEFAULT/NON-COMPLIANCE (ORDER) FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 05/13/2011

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FOR UNNAMED TENANTS FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 04/08/2011

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FOR UNNAMED TENANTS FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 04/08/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (ANSWER UD) FILED BY CODAWN CONSULTING CORPORATION ON 04/05/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (ANSWER UD) FILED BY CODAWN CONSULTING CORPORATION ON 04/05/2011

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 07/05/2011

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 07/05/2011

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 03/15/2011

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 03/15/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 04/25/2011

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 04/25/2011

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/25/2011 AT 09:00:00 AM IN LH04 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/25/2011 AT 09:00:00 AM IN LH04 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 04/08/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 04/08/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10861001 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10684893.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10861001 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10684893.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 03/15/2011

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 03/15/2011

COMPLAINT FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 03/15/2011

COMPLAINT FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 03/15/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 04/08/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 04/08/2011

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 04/08/2011

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 04/08/2011

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 03/22/2011

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 03/22/2011

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/30/2013

CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2011
View Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 07/05/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2011
View Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10906806 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10730698.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2011

WRIT ISSUED.

05/13/2011
View Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 05/13/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2011

CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2011

COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2011
View Court Documents

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 05/17/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2011
View Court Documents

DECLARATION OF DEFAULT/NON-COMPLIANCE (ORDER) FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 05/13/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2011
View Court Documents

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 04/25/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
04/05/2011
View Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (ANSWER UD) FILED BY CODAWN CONSULTING CORPORATION ON 04/05/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2011
View Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10861001 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10684893.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2011
View Court Documents

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 03/22/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2011
View Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2011
View Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CODAWN CONSULTING CORPORATION ON 03/21/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2011
View Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2011
View Court Documents

CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2011
View Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 03/15/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2011
View Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 03/15/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2011
View Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY PARK NEWPORT, LTD ON 03/15/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records