This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 04:20:11 (UTC).

GREGORIO PEREZ TRUJILLO VS. VINTAGE DESIGN, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2017 GREGORIO PEREZ TRUJILLO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against VINTAGE DESIGN, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse :

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREGORIO PEREZ TRUJILLO

Defendant

VINTAGE DESIGN, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MILHAUPT AND COHEN A. PROF. CORP

LERNER, MOORE, SILVA, CUNNINGHAM & RUBEL PLC

Defendant Attorney

CALL & JENSEN, APC

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MARY E. LYNCH

LERNER, MOORE, SILVA, CUNNINGHAM & RUB

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/11/2019.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/11/2019.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/18/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/18/2018

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DUNNING, KIM ON 10/20/2017.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DUNNING, KIM ON 10/20/2017.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 03/04/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 03/04/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 05/23/2018 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 05/23/2018 10:00:00 AM.

JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 05/18/2018

JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 05/18/2018

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 06/28/2019

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 06/28/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4867333 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4867333 REJECTED.

STIPULATION - OTHER (FOR AMENDMENTS TO THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 06/11/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER (FOR AMENDMENTS TO THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 06/11/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/28/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/28/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 04/11/2019

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 04/11/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 10/20/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 10/20/2017

MOTION - OTHER (FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL) FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 04/09/2019

MOTION - OTHER (FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL) FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 04/09/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12276350 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12100090.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12276350 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12100090.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 10/20/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 10/20/2017

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/03/2019
View Court Documents

AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 07/03/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION 1640570 RECEIVED ON 07/03/2019 11:16:12 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2019
View Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4985466 REJECTED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2019
View Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND SCHEDULE FINAL APPROVAL HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2019

MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/21/2019 AT 02:00:00 PM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2019
View Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/28/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2019
View Court Documents

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 06/28/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION 4985465 RECEIVED ON 06/28/2019 01:49:56 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019
View Court Documents

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE REDLINE & CLEAN VERSION OF DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED) FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 06/25/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION 1637542 RECEIVED ON 06/25/2019 11:14:27 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
82 More Docket Entries
12/26/2017
View Court Documents

DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OF MARY E. LYNCH) FILED BY VINTAGE DESIGN, INC. ON 12/26/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION 3620286 RECEIVED ON 12/26/2017 02:48:57 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2017
View Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 12/01/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION 4792524 RECEIVED ON 12/01/2017 11:21:20 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2017
View Court Documents

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DUNNING, KIM ON 10/20/2017.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2017
View Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12240513 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12064193.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2017
View Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 10/20/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2017
View Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 10/20/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2017
View Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY TRUJILLO, GREGORIO PEREZ ON 10/20/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION 3599578 RECEIVED ON 10/20/2017 11:24:05 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records