This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 12:20:14 (UTC).

COUNTY OF ORANGE VS MARCUS WALLEY

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 COUNTY OF ORANGE filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against MARCUS WALLEY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse :

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF ORANGE

Defendant

WALLEY, MARCUS

Not Classified By Court

BRANTLEY, CRYSTAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DCSS

 

Court Documents

MINUTES - DCSS ORDER (GOVT) 02/17/2022

MINUTES - DCSS ORDER (GOVT) 02/17/2022

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/15/2022

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/15/2022

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/08/2022

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/08/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL (GOVERNMENTAL) 12/07/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL (GOVERNMENTAL) 12/07/2021

NOTICE - MOTION (GOVERNMENTAL) - MODIFICATION 12/02/2021

NOTICE - MOTION (GOVERNMENTAL) - MODIFICATION 12/02/2021

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/15/2018

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/15/2018

MINUTES - DCSS JUDGMENT (GOVT) 05/15/2018

MINUTES - DCSS JUDGMENT (GOVT) 05/15/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/11/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/11/2018

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/25/2018

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/25/2018

RESPONSE - GOVT NOTICE OF MOTION / OSC (GOVT) 04/25/2018

RESPONSE - GOVT NOTICE OF MOTION / OSC (GOVT) 04/25/2018

MOTION - JUDGMENT 04/11/2018

MOTION - JUDGMENT 04/11/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 04/02/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 04/02/2018

ANSWER - COMPLAINT RE PARENTAL OBLIGATION (GOVT) 03/29/2018 NO PHONE NUMBER

ANSWER - COMPLAINT RE PARENTAL OBLIGATION (GOVT) 03/29/2018 NO PHONE NUMBER

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/14/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/14/2018

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 02/09/2018 Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 02/09/2018 Summons and Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/17/2022

HearingDescription: HEARING - MOTION - MODIFICATION; Department: L54

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022

DocketHEARING - MOTION - MODIFICATION

02/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMINUTES - DCSS ORDER (GOVT) 02/17/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/15/2022; Filing Party: WALLEY, MARCUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/08/2022; Filing Party: BRANTLEY, CRYSTAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL (GOVERNMENTAL) 12/07/2021; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - MOTION (GOVERNMENTAL) - MODIFICATION 12/02/2021; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2018

HearingDescription: HEARING - MOTION - JUDGMENT; Department: L54

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2018

DocketHEARING - MOTION - JUDGMENT

05/15/2018
View Court Documents

DocketMINUTES - DCSS JUDGMENT (GOVT) 05/15/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2018
View Court Documents

DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/15/2018; Filing Party: WALLEY, MARCUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2018
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/11/2018; Filing Party: BRANTLEY, CRYSTAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE - GOVT NOTICE OF MOTION / OSC (GOVT) 04/25/2018; Filing Party: BRANTLEY, CRYSTAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2018
View Court Documents

DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/25/2018; Filing Party: BRANTLEY, CRYSTAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2018
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - JUDGMENT 04/11/2018; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2018
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 04/02/2018; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2018
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER - COMPLAINT RE PARENTAL OBLIGATION (GOVT) 03/29/2018 NO PHONE NUMBER; Filing Party: WALLEY, MARCUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2018
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/14/2018; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 02/09/2018 Summons and Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records