This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/19/2022 at 00:26:27 (UTC).

CATHLEEN SILER VS THOMAS SILER, SR.

Case Summary

On 05/30/2017 CATHLEEN SILER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against THOMAS SILER, SR. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse :

    Orange County Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

Respondent

SILER, THOMAS JAY, SR.

 

Court Documents

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/30/2017 Amount:$435.00

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/30/2017 Amount:$435.00

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 05/30/2017

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 05/30/2017

SUMMONS 05/30/2017

SUMMONS 05/30/2017

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/30/2017

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/30/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 06/22/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 06/22/2017

NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 11/29/2017

NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 11/29/2017

NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 05/07/2018

NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 05/07/2018

PETITION - AMENDED 05/24/2018 Petition - Amended

PETITION - AMENDED 05/24/2018 Petition - Amended

PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 05/24/2018 Petitioner's Comm Prop Declaration

PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 05/24/2018 Petitioner's Comm Prop Declaration

PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 05/24/2018 Petitioner's Sep Prop Declaration

PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 05/24/2018 Petitioner's Sep Prop Declaration

PROOF OF SERVICE 06/06/2018 Proof of Service of Amended Petition

PROOF OF SERVICE 06/06/2018 Proof of Service of Amended Petition

REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 07/12/2018 Request - Enter Default

REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 07/12/2018 Request - Enter Default

PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 10/03/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 10/03/2018

WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/03/2018

WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/03/2018

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 10/03/2018

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 10/03/2018

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 10/03/2018

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 10/03/2018

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 10/03/2018

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 10/03/2018

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/03/2018

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/03/2018

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/03/2018
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 10/03/2018; Filing Party: SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2018
View Court Documents

DocketWAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/03/2018; Filing Party: SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 10/03/2018; Filing Party: SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2018
View Court Documents

DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 10/03/2018; Filing Party: SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2018
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 10/03/2018; Filing Party: SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/03/2018; Filing Party: SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 07/12/2018 Request - Enter Default; Filing Party: SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2018
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE 06/06/2018 Proof of Service of Amended Petition; Filing Party: SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2018

HearingDescription: CONFERENCE - STATUS; Department: L74

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2018

DocketCONFERENCE - STATUS

2 More Docket Entries
05/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketPROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 05/24/2018 Petitioner's Sep Prop Declaration; Filing Party: SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 05/07/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2018

DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/21/2018 Declaration - Service Of Declaration Of Disclosure; Filing Party: SILER, THOMAS JAY, SR.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/02/2018

DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/02/2018 Declaration - Service Of Declaration Of Disclosure; Filing Party: SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2017
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - CASE REVIEW 11/29/2017

06/22/2017
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 06/22/2017; Filing Party: SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2017
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/30/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2017
View Court Documents

DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 05/30/2017; Filing Party: SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2017
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS 05/30/2017; Filing Party: SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2017
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/30/2017; Filing Party: SILER, CATHLEEN MCGRATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records