This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 12:42:03 (UTC).

JUNE BREDE VS WALTER MICHAELIS

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 JUNE BREDE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WALTER MICHAELIS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse :

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

June, Brede D

BREDE, JUNE D

Respondent

Michaelis, Walter R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

GLOVER, JON-RENE M.

MCALLISTER GLOVER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/27/2019

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/27/2019

STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 09/27/2019

STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 09/27/2019

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 09/27/2019

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 09/27/2019

MINUTE ORDER 09/27/2019

MINUTE ORDER 09/27/2019

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 08/07/2019

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 08/07/2019

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/10/2019 Declaration - Service Of Declaration Of Disclosure

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/10/2019 Declaration - Service Of Declaration Of Disclosure

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/09/2019 Income & Expense Declaration

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/09/2019 Income & Expense Declaration

PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 07/09/2019 Property Declaration - Community

PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 07/09/2019 Property Declaration - Community

REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 07/09/2019 Request - Enter Default

REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 07/09/2019 Request - Enter Default

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/02/2019 Proof Of Service - Summons

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/02/2019 Proof Of Service - Summons

SUMMONS 04/24/2019

SUMMONS 04/24/2019

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 04/24/2019

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 04/24/2019

NOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 04/24/2019

NOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 04/24/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/27/2019

HearingDescription: HEARING - DISSOLUTION - UNCONTESTED; Department: L61

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2019

DocketHEARING - DISSOLUTION - UNCONTESTED

09/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMINUTE ORDER 09/27/2019

09/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 09/27/2019

09/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 09/27/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/27/2019; Filing Party: BREDE, JUNE D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019

DocketNOTICE - DEFAULT HEARING 08/07/2019; Filing Party: BREDE, JUNE D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 08/07/2019; Filing Party: BREDE, JUNE D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/10/2019 Declaration - Service Of Declaration Of Disclosure; Filing Party: BREDE, JUNE D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 07/09/2019 Request - Enter Default; Filing Party: BREDE, JUNE D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 07/09/2019 Property Declaration - Community; Filing Party: BREDE, JUNE D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/09/2019 Income & Expense Declaration; Filing Party: BREDE, JUNE D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/02/2019 Proof Of Service - Summons; Filing Party: BREDE, JUNE D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 04/24/2019; Filing Party: BREDE, JUNE D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 04/24/2019; Filing Party: BREDE, JUNE D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS 04/24/2019; Filing Party: BREDE, JUNE D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records