This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/11/2017 at 10:40:14 (UTC).

ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES VS. MANFRED THYSSEN

Case Summary

On 10/07/2011 ANDRADE ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MANFRED THYSSEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse :

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES

Defendants

MANFRED HEINZ THYSSEN JR

KAREN THYSSEN

MANFRED THYSSEN

AIR TECHNOLOGY OF KALIFORNIA

HEATING AND AIR TECHNOLOGY OF CALIFORNIA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/07/2011

COMPLAINT FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/07/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/19/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/19/2011

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/07/2011

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/07/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/19/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/19/2011

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 03/19/2012

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 03/19/2012

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/07/2011

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/07/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/21/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/21/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/21/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/21/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/19/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/19/2011

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

 

Docket Entries

03/19/2012

CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2012

COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2012
View Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 03/19/2012

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2012
View Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

01/31/2012

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/2012 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2011
View Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/21/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2011
View Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/21/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2011
View Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/19/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2011
View Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/19/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2011
View Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/19/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2011
View Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2011
View Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/07/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2011
View Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/07/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2011
View Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ANDRADE & ASSOCIATES ON 10/07/2011

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records