This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2023 at 17:25:08 (UTC).

HELBERG, ROXINE VS SHAPIRO, GRANT

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 HELBERG, ROXINE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SHAPIRO, GRANT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RIFF, LAWRENCE P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse :

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HELBERG ROXINE

Respondent

SHAPIRO GRANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROYCE-GROTZINGER KRISTINA CECILIA

Respondent Attorney

MANNIS JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Notice - Case Assignment

4/22/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/22/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Summons

4/15/2021: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/15/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

4/15/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Declaration - UCCJEA

4/15/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

FL_General Family Law FL - Notice - Case Status Conference - FCCR 1

9/28/2021: FL_General Family Law FL - Notice - Case Status Conference - FCCR 1

Minute Order

11/22/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service Proof of Electronic Service

12/20/2021: Proof of Service Proof of Electronic Service

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

12/21/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

12/20/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - UCCJEA Respondent's Declaration - UCCJEA

12/20/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA Respondent's Declaration - UCCJEA

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

4/26/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/26/2022

DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2021

DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021

DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Respondent's Declaration - UCCJEA ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021

DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation (Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021

DocketProof of Service (Proof of Electronic Service ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2A, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021

DocketMinute Order

09/28/2021

DocketNotice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2021

DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2021

DocketNotice - Case Assignment

04/15/2021

DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

04/15/2021

DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

04/15/2021

DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2021

DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records