This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 07:07:17 (UTC).

DOME CENTER LLC VS CAFFE PRIMO 110 LLC

Case Summary

On 01/09/2017 DOME CENTER LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against CAFFE PRIMO 110 LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse :

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

DOME CENTER LLC

Respondents and Defendants

CAFFE PRIMO 110 LLC

DOES 1 TO 20

CAFFE PRIMO

PRIMO CAFFE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

GOODKIN DANIEL L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

1/9/2017: SUMMONS

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

1/9/2017: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

Minute Order

5/9/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/12/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

05/30/2017

at 08:30 AM in Department 32; Unknown Event Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2017

Request for Dismissal; Filed by Dome Center, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

05/09/2017

at 08:30 AM in Department 32; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2017

Minute Order

01/09/2017

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2017

SUMMONS

01/09/2017

Complaint; Filed by Dome Center, LLC (Plaintiff)

Search Court Records