This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2024 at 22:45:42 (UTC).

CHARLES HOLT VS AMY KATHLEEN GALL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 CHARLES HOLT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMY KATHLEEN GALL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JILL FEENEY and LYNNE M. HOBBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JILL FEENEY

LYNNE M. HOBBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOLT CHARLES

Defendants and Cross Defendants

GALL AMY KATHLEEN

KOZIAK SASHA MICHELLE

ISLAND ASHLYN LYDAWN

MAY JALIN JAMAL

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

KOZIAK SASHA MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEMTOUB MICHAEL ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MARGARYAN MARY

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KALPAKIAN STEPHEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/29/2024: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Stipulation and Order : STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MSC, TRIAL AND CUTOFF DATES

4/18/2024: Stipulation and Order : STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MSC, TRIAL AND CUTOFF DATES

Minute Order: (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial;)

1/9/2024: Minute Order: (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial;)

Certificate of Mailing for: (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial;) of 01/09/2024

1/9/2024: Certificate of Mailing for: (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial;) of 01/09/2024

Notice of Ruling

1/9/2024: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Continue Trial Date: And All related Dates

12/8/2023: Motion to Continue Trial Date: And All related Dates

Minute Order: (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure of Plaintiff to...)

11/29/2023: Minute Order: (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure of Plaintiff to...)

Certificate of Mailing for: (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure of Plaintiff to...) of 11/29/2023

11/29/2023: Certificate of Mailing for: (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure of Plaintiff to...) of 11/29/2023

Order - Dismissal

11/29/2023: Order - Dismissal

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/17/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/17/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/15/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/15/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order: (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure of Plaintiff to...)

7/7/2023: Minute Order: (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure of Plaintiff to...)

Declaration : Declaration of counsel

6/23/2023: Declaration : Declaration of counsel

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/15/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/15/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order: (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure of Plaintiff to...)

5/3/2023: Minute Order: (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure of Plaintiff to...)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/13/2024

Hearing08/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2024

Hearing07/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department T at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2024

DocketCase reassigned to Alhambra Courthouse in Department T - Hon. Ian C. Fusselmaneffective 05/13/2024; Reason: Inventory Transfer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2024

DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2024

DocketUpdated -- 07/30/2024 Final Status Conference: Location changed from Department 30 to Department T

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2024

DocketUpdated -- 08/13/2024 Jury Trial: Location changed from Department 30 to Department T

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2024

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 04/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 07/30/2024 10:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2024

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial scheduled for 05/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08/13/2024 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2024

DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MSC, TRIAL AND CUTOFF DATES; Signed and Filed by: Charles Holt (Plaintiff); As to: Amy Kathleen Gall (Defendant); Sasha Michelle Koziak (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2024

DocketUpdated -- Motion to Continue Trial Date And All related Dates: Filed By: Amy Kathleen Gall (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 01/09/2024

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
72 More Docket Entries
06/08/2021

DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2021

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2021

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2021

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2021

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Charles Holt (Plaintiff); As to: Amy Kathleen Gall (Defendant); Sasha Michelle Koziak (Defendant); Jalin Jamal May (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2021

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Charles Holt (Plaintiff); As to: Amy Kathleen Gall (Defendant); Sasha Michelle Koziak (Defendant); Jalin Jamal May (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Charles Holt (Plaintiff); As to: Amy Kathleen Gall (Defendant); Sasha Michelle Koziak (Defendant); Jalin Jamal May (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2021

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2021

DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Charles Holt (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2021

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records