This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2022 at 23:41:31 (UTC).

AYSHA KHOURY VS KAISER PERMANENTE BERNARD J. TYSON SCHOOL OF MEDICINE, INC., A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 AYSHA KHOURY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against KAISER PERMANENTE BERNARD J TYSON SCHOOL OF MEDICINE, INC , A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY W. ALARCON, ELAINE LU, WENDY CHANG and RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8383

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD L. FRUIN

WENDY CHANG

GREGORY W. ALARCON

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHOURY AYSHA MD MPH

Defendant

KAISER PERMANENTE BERNARD J. TYSON SCHOOL OF MEDICINE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SMITH NATHAN M.

HOLDER LISA

SMITH NATHAN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

AVUNJIAN HELEN

SMITH KATHERINE V

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT KAISER PERMANENTE BERNARD J. TYSON SCHOOL OF MEDICINES EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF AYSHA KHOURYS MOT

9/29/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT KAISER PERMANENTE BERNARD J. TYSON SCHOOL OF MEDICINES EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF AYSHA KHOURYS MOT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/29/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING ON THE MOTION TO SEAL

9/29/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING ON THE MOTION TO SEAL

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NATHAN SMITH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AYSHA KHOURYS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING ON THE MOTION TO SEAL

9/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NATHAN SMITH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AYSHA KHOURYS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING ON THE MOTION TO SEAL

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TIAUNIA N. HENRY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KAISER PERMANENTE BERNARD J. TYSON SCHOOL OF MEDICINES EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING DATE ON

9/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TIAUNIA N. HENRY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KAISER PERMANENTE BERNARD J. TYSON SCHOOL OF MEDICINES EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING THE HEARING DATE ON

Proof of Service by Mail

9/29/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 09/12/2022

9/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 09/12/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

9/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

Response - RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

8/31/2022: Response - RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Notice of Related Case

8/26/2022: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/29/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DR. AYSHA KHOURY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL

8/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DR. AYSHA KHOURY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF DOCUMENTS CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL

8/19/2022: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF DOCUMENTS CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL

Motion for Summary Judgment

8/19/2022: Motion for Summary Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/19/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SEEKING: (I) A CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT KAISER PERMANENTE BERNARD J. TYSON SCHOOL OF MEDICINES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND, IN T

7/21/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SEEKING: (I) A CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT KAISER PERMANENTE BERNARD J. TYSON SCHOOL OF MEDICINES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND, IN T

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MARCELLUS MCRAE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KAISER PERMANENTE BERNARD J. TYSON SCHOOL OF MEDICINES EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES STIPULATI

8/2/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MARCELLUS MCRAE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KAISER PERMANENTE BERNARD J. TYSON SCHOOL OF MEDICINES EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES STIPULATI

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TIAUNIA N. HENRY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KAISER PERMANENTE BERNARD J. TYSON SCHOOL OF MEDICINES EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES STIPULAT

8/2/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TIAUNIA N. HENRY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KAISER PERMANENTE BERNARD J. TYSON SCHOOL OF MEDICINES EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES STIPULAT

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • Hearing03/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • Hearing03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • Hearing10/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • Hearing10/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • Hearing09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an Order Advancing the Hearing Date on Plaintiff Aysha Khourys Motion to Seal Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment summary Adjudication to Same Hearing Date as the Motion for Summary Judgement/Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Defendant Kaiser Permanente Bernard J. Tyson School of Medicines Ex Parte Application For an Order Advancing the Hearing Date on Plaintiff Aysha Khourys Motion to Seal Defendants Motion for Summary Judgmentsummary Adjudication to Same Hearing Date as); Filed by Kaiser Permanente Bernard J. Tyson School of Medicine, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketOpposition (TO DEFENDANT?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING ON THE MOTION TO SEAL); Filed by Aysha Khoury, MD, MPH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Kaiser Permanente Bernard J. Tyson School of Medicine, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Tiaunia N. Henry In Support of Defendant Kaiser Permanente Bernard J. Tyson School of Medicines Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing the Hearing Date on Plaintiff Aysha Khourys Motion to Seal Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Kaiser Permanente Bernard J. Tyson School of Medicine, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF NATHAN SMITH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AYSHA KHOURY?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING ON THE MOTION TO SEAL); Filed by Aysha Khoury, MD, MPH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance (of Counsel); Filed by Kaiser Permanente Bernard J. Tyson School of Medicine, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Kaiser Permanente Bernard J. Tyson School of Medicine, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kaiser Permanente Bernard J. Tyson School of Medicine, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (- Joint Stipulation To Extend Time To Respond to the Complaint by Not More Than 15 Days); Filed by Kaiser Permanente Bernard J. Tyson School of Medicine, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Aysha Khoury, MD, MPH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Aysha Khoury, MD, MPH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Aysha Khoury, MD, MPH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Aysha Khoury, MD, MPH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Aysha Khoury, MD, MPH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Aysha Khoury, MD, MPH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER PERMANENTE BERNARD J. TYSON SCHOOL OF MEDICINE INC. A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH NATHAN M.