This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2015 at 07:15:49 (UTC).

Jacqueline Duarte Vs Thomas Pottmeyer Co

Case Summary

On 06/15/2001 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by Jacqueline Duarte against Thomas Pottmeyer Co in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse :

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Edward A. Ferns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Duarte Jacqueline

Defendant

Thomas Pottmeyer Co

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/20/2003

Docketat 08:30 am in Department 69, Edward A. Ferns, Presiding; Final Status Conference (Continued from 8-28-02 pursuant tostip & order filed on 7-26-02----------------------------------TRIAL DATE: 3-3-03----------------------------------) - Trial Date Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2003

DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE: ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2003

Docketat 08:30 am in Department 69, Edward A. Ferns, Presiding; Order Re: Related Cases - Denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2003

DocketStipulation (and [Proposed] Order to Consolidate Related Actions and to Continue the Trial Date in the Earlier Filed Action ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2003

DocketNotice (of compliance with local rule 7.3 (F) ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/02/2003

DocketAssociation of Attorney (PAUL BERSHIN attorney of record for plaintiff JACQUELINE DUARTE hereby associates ALAN G. SALER as co-counsel for plaintiff JACQUELINE DUARTE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2002

DocketNotice (OF LIEN ); Filed by Creditor

07/26/2002

DocketStipulation and Order (Continuing the Discovery Cut Off, FSC & Trial Dates ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2001

Docketat 08:30 am in Department 69, Edward A. Ferns, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Trial Date Set

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2001

DocketStatus Conference Questionnaire; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2001

DocketNotice of Status Conference filed

08/30/2001

DocketAnswer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2001

DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2001

DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2001

DocketComplaint

Search Court Records