This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2015 at 12:20:21 (UTC).

David Lo Vs Todai Puente Hills

Case Summary

On 12/19/2002 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by David Lo against Todai Puente Hills in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2002

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse :

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Jaeger, Karl W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chao Shen

Fin Li-fin Shen

Lo David

Defendants

Meramia Cerritos

Meramia Glendale

Meramia Llc.

Meramia Restaurant Management

Meramia Studio City

Meramia Woodland Hills

Todai Japanese Restaurant

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/07/2016

DocketPaper file destroyed; Filed by Court

04/04/2003

Docketat 09:30 am in Department G, Jaeger, Karl W., Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Transfer to Municipal Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2003

DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (SEE 4/4/03 MINUTE ORDER ); Filed by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2003

DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed (TODAI PUENTE HILLS, LLC ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2003

DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2003

DocketNtc OSC failure to file P/S; Filed by Court

02/18/2003

DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (TODAI RESTAURANT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2003

DocketNotice of Vacated Hearing; Filed by Court

12/24/2002

DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/24/2002

DocketNotice of Status Conference; Filed by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2002

DocketComplaint Filed

Search Court Records