Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 01:02:14 (UTC).

THIBAULT CHRISTIAN STRACKE VS SUTTON STRACKE

Case Summary

On 09/22/2016 THIBAULT CHRISTIAN STRACKE filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against SUTTON STRACKE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5925

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STACKE THIBAULT CHRISTIAN

Respondent

STACKE SUTTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LANDESMAN LAURA SUSAN

Respondent Attorney

CLEMENS BRUCE ARCHER

 

Court Documents

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Review - Judgment - FCCR3 - RESP

1/18/2018: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Review - Judgment - FCCR3 - RESP

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice- Case Review - Judgment - FCCR3 - PET

1/18/2018: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice- Case Review - Judgment - FCCR3 - PET

Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment - Noticed by LASC

1/18/2018: Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment - Noticed by LASC

Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment - Noticed by LASC

1/18/2018: Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment - Noticed by LASC

FL_General Family Law - Notice

1/19/2018: FL_General Family Law - Notice

FL_General Family Law - Notice

1/19/2018: FL_General Family Law - Notice

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

12/27/2018: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Joinder - Request for Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan

1/23/2019: Joinder - Request for Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan

Joinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan

1/23/2019: Joinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan

Declaration - Default FL170

2/4/2019: Declaration - Default FL170

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

2/4/2019: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

2/4/2019: Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

Notice - Entry of Judgment

3/7/2019: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Judgment

3/7/2019: Judgment

Stay of Service of Earnings Assignment Order

3/12/2019: Stay of Service of Earnings Assignment Order

Order - Earnings Asgnmnt Spousal/Partner Support(Family Law)

3/12/2019: Order - Earnings Asgnmnt Spousal/Partner Support(Family Law)

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

3/13/2019: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order

4/14/2021: Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOrder - Qualified Domestic Relations Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketStay of Service of Earnings Assignment Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketOrder - Earnings Asgnmnt Spousal/Partner Support(Family Law); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketJoinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketResponse (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Stacke, Sutton - Filed and Entered on 2016-12-16 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketMilestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 12-22-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Stacke, Sutton ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (- Signed on 2016-11-09 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (mail + NOAR )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketMilestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 12-01-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • DocketPetition - Legal Separation w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • DocketSummons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Stacke, Thibault ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Stacke, Thibault ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLEMENS BRUCE ARCHER