This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2016 19:42:20

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 03/19/2008 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Sho Kosugi against Shook Gim Kosugi in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXX2508
  • Filing Date 03/19/2008
  • Case Status Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Petitioner Kosugi Sho
  • Represented By
    • Kim Peter A.
  • Respondent Kosugi Shook Gim
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2009
  • Judgment
  • 01/12/2009
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc
  • 01/12/2009
  • Declaration-Default
  • 01/12/2009
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment
  • 01/12/2009
  • Stipulation-Waive Service Dec Disc
  • 12/18/2008
  • Judgment-Package Received-STIP
  • 08/27/2008
  • Declaration-Property
  • 08/27/2008
  • Request-Enter Default
  • 05/13/2008
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com
  • 05/13/2008
  • Declaration-Income & Expense
  • 05/13/2008
  • Notice-Acknowledgement of Receipt
  • 03/19/2008
  • Declaration-Property Filed by Petitioner
  • 03/19/2008
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner
  • 03/19/2008
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.