This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 11:52:32 (UTC).

ROBYN JO HILTON VS ALAN J MIHOCES

Case Summary

On 10/25/2016 ROBYN JO HILTON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALAN J MIHOCES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8228

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HILTON ROBYN JO

Respondent

MIHOCES ALAN J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

ALLISON THOMAS D.

ALLISON THOMAS D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Mihoces, Alan ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Notice (PETITION - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hilton, Robyn Jo - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-24 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hilton, Robyn Jo ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hilton, Robyn Jo ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Petition - Amended (1st) (RESPONSE FILED 12/14/2016 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Mihoces, Alan - Granted on 2016-12-14 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Response (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Mihoces, Alan - Filed and Entered on 2016-12-14 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 12-22-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Proof of Service - Mail (RESPONSE - On Behalf of: Respondent: Mihoces, Alan - Service Date on 2016-12-06 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Mihoces, Alan ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hilton, Robyn Jo ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hilton, Robyn Jo ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hilton, Robyn Jo - Granted on 2016-10-25 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Hilton, Robyn Jo ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less