This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2015 at 23:53:44 (UTC).

RETAIL AND RESTAURANT GROWTH CAPITAL LP VS MAPLEWOOD PARTNER

Case Summary

On 02/27/2008 RETAIL AND RESTAURANT GROWTH CAPITAL LP filed an Other lawsuit against MAPLEWOOD PARTNER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH W. DAU. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse :

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH W. DAU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RETAIL AND RESTAURANT GROWTH CAPITAL L.P

Defendants

GLASER ROBERT

JULIO & SONS COMPANY

MAPLEWOOD HOLDINGS LLC

MAPLEWOOD MANAGEMENT L.P.

MAPLEWOOD PARTNERS L.P.

UNCLE JULIO'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MCGOLDRICK JULIE M.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO ISSUE MISCELLANEOUS CASE NUMBER ;

2/27/2008: REQUEST TO ISSUE MISCELLANEOUS CASE NUMBER ;

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DISMISSAL, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR RELIEF UNDER CCP SECTION 473

6/2/2008: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DISMISSAL, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR RELIEF UNDER CCP SECTION 473

Minute Order

5/27/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/29/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/18/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/2/2008: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/28/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

08/29/2008

Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2008

Ex-Parte Application (FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DISMISSAL, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR RELFIE UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 473 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2008

Notice of Status Conference filed

02/27/2008

Request

Search Court Records