This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2023 at 22:15:21 (UTC).

PAIGE HYLAND VS ABIGAIL LEE MILLER

Case Summary

On 10/09/2014 PAIGE HYLAND filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ABIGAIL LEE MILLER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HYLAND PAIGE

Defendant

MILLER ABIGAIL LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JACKON MARCUS ESQ.

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL R. SHAPIRO APC

Defendant Attorney

GROTZINGER JORDAN D. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/05/2016

DocketDocument:Remittitur Filed by: Clerk

12/01/2015

DocketMinute order entered: 2015-12-01 00:00:00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2015

DocketDocument:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2015

DocketProceeding/Event:MINOR'S COMPROMISE CLAIM (PC 3500) Ruth Ann Kwan 9:00 am

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2015

DocketCalendaring:MINOR'S COMPROMISE CLAIM (PC 3500) 12/01/15 at 9:00 am Ruth Ann Kwan

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2015

DocketDocument:Petition-Hearing Minor's Compromise Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2015

DocketDocument:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2015

DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2015

DocketDocument:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2015

DocketDocument:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Appellant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
01/16/2015

DocketDocument:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2015

DocketDocument:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2014

DocketDocument:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2014

DocketDocument:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2014

DocketDocument:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2014

DocketDocument:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2014

DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2014

DocketDocument:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2014

DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

10/09/2014

DocketCase Filed/Opened:Intentional PI/PD/WD (eg. assault)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records