This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/14/2020 at 02:38:49 (UTC).

MARIANNE NESTOR CASSINI VS CHRISTINA TIERNEY CASSINI ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/16/2010 MARIANNE NESTOR CASSINI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CHRISTINA TIERNEY CASSINI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse :

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASSINI MARIANNE NESTOR

Defendants

BELMONT GRANATA

CASSINI CHRISTINA TIERNEY

CASSINI DARIA TIERNEY

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVISSON MICHAEL R.

Defendant Attorney

ORRICK HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/12/2012

DocketUnknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

12/12/2012

DocketREMITTITUR

06/04/2011

DocketNtc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2011

DocketNOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERKS TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2011

DocketNtc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2011

DocketNOTICE TO REPORTERS TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2011

DocketAPPELLANTS NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2011

DocketNotice of Designation of Record; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2011

DocketNtc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2011

DocketNOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
61 More Docket Entries
06/24/2010

DocketDEFENDANT CHRISTINA LOIEVSKI CASSINIS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH AND DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER AN INDISPENSABLE PARTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2010

DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2010

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

05/27/2010

DocketNotice; Filed by Court

05/27/2010

DocketORDER OF REMAND

05/07/2010

DocketNOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTIES AND COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2010

DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Christina Tierney Cassini (Defendant); Granata Belmont (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2010

DocketComplaint; Filed by Marianne Nestor Cassini (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2010

DocketSUMMONS

02/16/2010

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records