This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 14:11:17 (UTC).

WEN WEN VS TRIPALINK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 WEN WEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TRIPALINK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEN WEN

Defendant

TRIPALINK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/10/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/10/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

1/14/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/14/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/14/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/24/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/7/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/7/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/7/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

03/07/2022

DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Tripalink Property Management Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022

DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Wen Wen on 01/10/2022 as follows: Defendant Tripalink Property Management Inc K-Town does not owe the plaintiff Wen Wen any money on plaintiff's claim.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022

DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

03/07/2022

DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/07/2022 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 03/07/2022; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2022

DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Wen Wen (Plaintiff); As to: Tripalink Property Management Inc (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/19/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2022

DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Wen Wen (Plaintiff); As to: Tripalink Property Management Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2022

DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2022

DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2022

DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Wen Wen (Plaintiff); As to: Tripalink Property Management Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2022

DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2022

DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2022

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/07/2022 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records