This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2016 at 17:22:08 (UTC).

Low, Judy Vs. Benavidez, Maria Luz

Case Summary

On 10/17/2001 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Low Judy against Benavidez Maria Luz in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

R.carlton Seaver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Low Judy

Defendants

Benavidez Patricia

Benavidez Maria Luz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/16/2011

DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2001

DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 005 , HON. R.CARLTON SEAVER,JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2001

DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 11/19/01 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2001

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2001

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (BENAVIDEZ, MARIA LUZ) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/19/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 005 . COSTS OF $ 00.00 .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2001

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (BENAVIDEZ, PATRICIA) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/19/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 005 . COSTS OF $ 00.00 .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2001

DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAC407562014 . HEARING SET FOR 11/19/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 005

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records