This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2020 at 00:00:58 (UTC).

ARSHAM TABIBIAN VS ROYAL RITZ COLLISION CENTER

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 ARSHAM TABIBIAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROYAL RITZ COLLISION CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL C. KELLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse :

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TABIBIAN ARSHAM

Defendant

ROYAL RITZ COLLISION CENTER

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

2/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

2/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

2/20/2020: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

3/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

3/12/2020: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/26/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

5/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/11/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Reconsideration)

1/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Reconsideration)

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

1/16/2020: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

12/3/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

11/20/2019: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

11/13/2019: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

11/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

10/31/2019: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/24/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/24/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/21/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/06/2020

Hearing10/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F44 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Hearing on Request for Court Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2020

DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2020

DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2020

DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 07/21/2020 at 03:00 PM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/06/2020 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2020

DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2020

DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2020

DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 06/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/21/2020 03:00 PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2020

DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2020

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 06/19/2020 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2020

DocketUpdated -- Order on Request for Court Order: As To Parties changed from Royal Ritz Collision Center (Defendant) to Royal Ritz Collision Center (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
09/24/2019

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/24/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 09/24/2019; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2019

DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Arsham Tabibian against Defendant Royal Ritz Collision Center on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Arsham Tabibian on 08/15/2019 for the principal amount of $4,500.00 and costs of $145.00 for a total of $4,645.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2019

DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

09/24/2019

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/24/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2019

DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2019

DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Arsham Tabibian (Plaintiff); As to: Royal Ritz Collision Center (Defendant); Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/21/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2019

DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Arsham Tabibian (Plaintiff); As to: Royal Ritz Collision Center (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2019

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2019

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/24/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2019

DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Royal Ritz Collision Center (Defendant) to Royal Ritz Collision Center (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records