This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/18/2022 at 18:06:57 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Brown, Rushan Canute

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Brown, Rushan Canute. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Caraway, Corie J

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Brown, Rushan Canute

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Hill, Yuri B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/06/2022

DocketMotion hearings - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: [P] Motion for Forfeiture of Weapon PC18000/18005/18010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2022

DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2022

DocketMotion; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion for Forfeiture of Weapon PC18000/18005/18010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022

DispositionCourt Probation; 001; PC25850(a)-M- Carrying Loaded Handgun On Person In Public; Court Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 08/04/2022; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Term Type: Jail; Term: 30 Days; Stayed: 30 Days; Stayed Reason: Pending Successful Completion of Probation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022

DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC25850(a)-M- Carrying Loaded Handgun On Person In Public; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022

DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC25850(a)-M- Carrying Loaded Handgun On Person In Public; No Contest

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022

DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022

DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022

DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

08/04/2022

DocketProbation Order; Comment: signed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
01/07/2022

DocketPublic Defender Appointed

01/07/2022

DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR; Comment: Unsigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2022

DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2022

DocketStatement of Rights

01/07/2022

DocketMinute Order

01/07/2022

DocketFinancial Statement

01/07/2022

DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: Brown, Rushan Canute

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2021

DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney W. Stiles; BCSO 21-06046

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021

DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

ChargeCharges: Brown, Rushan Canute; 001; Description: PC25850(a)-M- Carrying Loaded Handgun On Person In Public; Statute: 25850(a); Level: Misdemeanor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records