This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/15/2017 at 07:08:02 (UTC).

White Tank Justice Court, Loretha Young Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2016 White Tank Justice Court, Loretha Young was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Harris, Myra. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Harris, Myra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Loretha Young

Defendants

Helen Bouchard-Bujak

Nicholas Bouchard-Bujak

Other

White Tank Justice Court

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Shawn Nelson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/03/2017

Docket512: Me: Record Appeal Ruling/Remand (docket date:2/3/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2017

Docket504: Me: Record Appeal Assignment (docket date:1/10/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2016

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:11/9/2016) (filing party: Originating Court(4))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2016

DocketMCM - Memorandum & Certificate Of Mailing (docket date:11/9/2016) (filing party: Originating Court(4))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2016

DocketNOTE: APPELLANT / ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2016

DocketMCM - Memorandum & Certificate Of Mailing (docket date:11/9/2016) (filing party: Originating Court(4))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2016

DocketNOTE: APPELLEE

11/07/2016

DocketTRM - Transmittal (docket date:11/9/2016) (filing party: Originating Court(4))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2016

DocketNOTE: OF RECORD

11/07/2016

DocketCDP - Compact Disc Of Proceedings (docket date:11/9/2016) (filing party: Originating Court(4))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
11/01/2016

DocketCME - Credit Memo (docket date:11/3/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2016

DocketNAL - Notice Appeal Lower Court (docket date:11/1/2016) (filing party: Originating Court(4))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2016

DocketNOP - Notice of Initial Perfection (docket date:11/1/2016) (filing party: Originating Court(4))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2016

DocketNFD - Notice Of Filing Fee Due (docket date:11/1/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2016

DocketNOTE: 11/2/16

10/26/2016

DocketRFP - Receipt Filing Fee Paid (docket date:11/1/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2016

DocketNOTE: 10/26/16

10/26/2016

DocketRFT- Request For Transmittal (docket date:11/1/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2016

DocketAPD - Application For Deferral (docket date:11/1/2016) (filing party: PLF/Appellant(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2016

DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:11/1/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records