This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/19/2016 at 20:11:52 (UTC).

Dorothy Ewart VS Huntington Restaurants Group Inc

Case Summary

On 03/19/2003 Dorothy Ewart filed an Other lawsuit against Huntington Restaurants Group Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is LeMaire, Kerstin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse :

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

LeMaire, Kerstin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dorothy Ewart

Defendant

Huntington Restaurants Group Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jack Hirsch

Defendant Attorney

William Schrank

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/30/2004

ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:5/12/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2004

NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

04/30/2004

STD - Stipulation To/For Dismissal (docket date:5/11/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2004

NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

01/14/2004

019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:1/14/2004)

12/23/2003

NOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:4/14/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2003

NOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:4/14/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2003

ORD - Order (docket date:2/19/2004)

10/09/2003

NOTE: OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

10/07/2003

STP - Stipulation (docket date:2/26/2004)

9 More Docket Entries
08/14/2003

NOTE: TO WITHDRAW DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2003

019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:8/1/2003)

07/24/2003

ANS - Answer (docket date:7/31/2003)

07/24/2003

NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS/ PAID

07/21/2003

APU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:8/5/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2003

NOTE: HUNTINGTON RESTAURANTS GROUP INC SERVED 07/12/03

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2003

AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:7/24/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2003

322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:6/25/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2003

COM - Complaint (docket date:3/21/2003)

03/19/2003

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:3/21/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records