This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 01/25/2023 at 12:18:54 (UTC).

BELLA VISTA VILLAGE POA V SWETZ ETAL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 BELLA VISTA VILLAGE POA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SWETZ ETAL -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Benton, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELLA VISTA VILLAGE POA

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF LAWRENCE C SWETZ AND CHARLOTTE D SWETZ

SWETZ, LAWRENCE C

SWETZ, CHARLOTTE D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

05/26/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

05/26/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

05/26/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

LIS PENDENS

05/26/2022: LIS PENDENS

AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER

07/05/2022: AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER

AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER

07/05/2022: AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER

WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

07/05/2022: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

08/01/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

08/10/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

08/10/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

DECREE OF FORECLOSURE

08/12/2022: DECREE OF FORECLOSURE

COMMISSIONERS SALE NOTICE

10/05/2022: COMMISSIONERS SALE NOTICE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

11/07/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

REPORT OF SALE

12/13/2022: REPORT OF SALE

ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

12/14/2022: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 5,; Entry: LOT 3 BLOCK 10 YORK BELLA VISTA VILLAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: REPORT OF SALE; Entry: LOT 3 BLOCK 10 YORK BELLA VISTA VILLAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: NOTICE OF COMISSIONERS SALE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COMMISSIONERS SALE NOTICE; Entry: 11/18/22 @ 10 AM LOT 3 BLOCK 10 YORK BELLA VISTA VILLAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022

DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

08/12/2022

DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: DECREE OF FORECLOSURE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 5,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022

DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: LAWRENCE C SWETZ 7/10/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: CHARLOTTE D SWETZ 7/10/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
07/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD; Entry: CHARLOTTE D SWETZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: LIS PENDENS; Entry: L202235307

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: CHARLOTTE D SWETZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: LAWRENCE C SWETZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $170.00 was made on receipt 04CI79331.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: MCCASH, DOUGLAS EDWARD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records