This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 02/26/2022 at 23:49:35 (UTC).

Village of Lake Hallie vs. Kristina Marie Dennis

Case Summary

On 11/11/2021 Village of Lake Hallie filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Kristina Marie Dennis. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Isaacson, James M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0885

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Isaacson, James M

 

Party Details

Defendant

Dennis, Kristina Marie

Cadott, WI 54727

Not Yet Classified

Village of Lake Hallie Atty

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Notice of Intent to Certify Debt, JFFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2021FO000885; Caption: Village of Lake Hallie vs. Kristina Marie Dennis; Total Amount: $263.5; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Kristina Marie Dennis; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 950 N Kelly St # 14, Cadott, WI 54727; Judgment Party; Party Name: Chippewa County Clerk of Circuit Court; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $263.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other; Amount: $263.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Final Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $263.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $263.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: DJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, James M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Isaacson, James M; Court Reporter: Fauske, Rheanna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, James M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $263.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Village of Lake Hallie PD; Officer Name: Meyers, Adam A; Violation Date: 2021-08-22; Plaintiff Agency: Village of Lake Hallie; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: LH8.4.02(2)(C)-1; Charge Description: CRIMINAL STATUTES ADOPTED-CRIMES AGAINST PROPERTY (CH. 943); Severity: Forf. U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from LHPD rescheduling court date to 12/7/21 @ 9:00 (document 2 moved to misfiling)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: LH8.4.02(2)(C)-1; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-12-07; Description: CRIMINAL STATUTES ADOPTED-CRIMES AGAINST PROPERTY (CH. 943); Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-12-07; Ordered Date: 2021-12-07; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Isaacson, James M; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    Read MoreRead Less