This case was last updated from Pierce County Courts on 07/01/2022 at 18:13:01 (UTC).

Township of Gilman vs. Mayan Briggs

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Township of Gilman filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Mayan Briggs. This case was filed in Pierce County Courts, Pierce County Circuit Court located in Pierce, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Gavic, Jorv R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0194

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Pierce, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Gavic, Jorv R

 

Party Details

Defendant

Briggs, Mayan

Not Yet Classified

Township of Gilman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Loberg, Robert L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/22/2022

HearingDescription: Status conference; Court Official: Gavic, Jorv R.; Location: Pierce County Courthouse; Type: Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Gavic, Jorv R.; Court Reporter: Unmonitored DAR; Additional Text: 4:25 PM Defendant Mayan Briggs appears in Court, Atty Jens Loberg and Phil Verges appears for the Township of Gilman. Includes 22FO146, 22FO147, 22FO183, 22FO184, 22FO185, 22FO186, 22FO193, 22FO194, 22FO195, 22FO222 and 22FO231 (STC). Atty Loberg is requesting a PTC about a month out. Atty Loberg states there are 4 more citations that were filed today. Court adjourned at 4:28 pm Status conference scheduled for July 22, 2022 at 04:00 pm.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on July 22, 2022 at 04:00 pm.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2022

DocketBond mount: $100.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Township of Gilman; Violation Date: 2022-04-27; Plaintiff Agency: Township of Gilman; Ordinance or Statute: Ordinance; Statute: 2004-2(12)(E); Charge Description: Barking Dogs; Severity: Forf. U

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022

DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on June 15, 2022 at 04:00 pm.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022

DocketEvent: Intake; Court Official: Gavic, Jorv R.; Court Reporter: Unmonitored DAR; Additional Text: 02:10 PM Defendant Mayan Briggs in Court pro se. Atty. Jens Loberg and Chairman Phil Verges appeared for the Township of Gilman. Includes Status on 22FO146, 22FO147, 22FO183, 22FO184, 22FO185, 22FO186. 22FO193, 22FO194, 22FO195, 22FO222, 22FO231 set for Initial on 06/06 but added to the calendar for today. Atty. Loberg requests Initials held and all cases set for additional hearing. Court addresses 22FO193, 22FO194, 22FO195, 22FO222, 22FO231, advises of charges. Defendant enters NG pleas. Court sets all cases for Status. Adjourned at 2:17 PM Status conference scheduled for June 15, 2022 at 04:00 pm.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022

DocketEvent: Not guilty plea; Court Official: Gavic, Jorv R.; Additional Text: Count 01

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022

DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2022

DocketEvent: Citation filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2022

DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2022

DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2022

ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 2004-2(12)(E); Plea: Not Guilty on 2022-06-03; Description: Barking Dogs

[+] Read More [-] Read Less