This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 23:31:15 (UTC).

Town of Iron River vs. Aladdin Dajion Bankhead

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Town of Iron River filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Aladdin Dajion Bankhead. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, John P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0134

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, John P

 

Party Details

Defendant

Bankhead, Aladdin Dajion

Saint Paul, MN 55103

Not Yet Classified

Iron River Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Bankhead, Aladdin Dajion; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Aladdin Dajion Bankhead Current: 995 Saint Albans St N Apt 102, Saint Paul, MN 55103 United States (Effective: 10-01-2021) Prior: 995 Saint Albans St N Apt 102, Saint Paul, MN 551031

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to DNR of non-compliance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to DNR of compliance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BAYFIELD; Case number: 2021FO000134; Caption: Town of Iron River vs. Aladdin Dajion Bankhead; Total Amount: $301.24; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Aladdin Dajion Bankhead; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 995 Saint Albans St N Apt 102, Saint Paul, MN 55103; Judgment Party; Party Name: Bayfield County Clerk of Circuit Court; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $295.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $1.04; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $1.04; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $1.04; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $1.04; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $1.04; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $1.04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other; Amount: $295.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: SDC 30 Day Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Nonmilitary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $296.04; Adjustments: $5.2; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $301.24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $295.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Iron River Police; Officer Name: Schneeberger, Ryan; Violation Date: 2021-03-05; Plaintiff Agency: Town of Iron River; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 961.41(3g)(e); Charge Description: Possession of THC (Forfeiture); Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 961.41(3g)(e); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-04-26; Description: Possession of THC (Forfeiture); Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-04-26; Ordered Date: 2021-04-26; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Anderson, John P.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less