This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 17:40:11 (UTC).

State of Wisconsin vs. William John Bruegger

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 State of Wisconsin filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against William John Bruegger. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, John P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0093

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, John P

 

Party Details

Defendant

Bruegger, William John

Winona, MN 55987

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Lawton, Kimberly

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: DE called and states he did not get his NOH for the status conference. Filing motion to re-open, asking if Judge will waive fee since he never received his notice.dz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D; Additional Text: Minutes Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Additional Text: DA by video

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on May 24, 2021 at 02:00 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $232.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Plate Number: 7259AT; Expiration: 2022; VIN: SN1PB6HS5BC135300; Issuing Agency: Dept. of Natural Resources; Violation Date: 2021-02-06; Plaintiff Agency: State of Wisconsin; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 350.10(1)(c); Charge Description: Operate Snowmobile-Fail/Comply Signs; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Intake; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D; Additional Text: Minutes Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Not guilty plea - written; Additional Text: Rec'd by fax from DE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $232.0; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $232.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 350.10(1)(c); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-05-24; Description: Operate Snowmobile-Fail/Comply Signs; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-05-24; Ordered Date: 2021-05-24; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Anderson, John P.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawton, Kimberly