This case was last updated from St. Croix County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 23:05:47 (UTC).

State of Wisconsin vs. Steven Leroy Jacobs

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 State of Wisconsin filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Steven Leroy Jacobs. This case was filed in St. Croix County Courts, St. Croix County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Needham, Scott and Heckmann, Timothy C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0324

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    St. Croix, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Needham, Scott

Heckmann, Timothy C

 

Party Details

Defendant

Jacobs, Steven Leroy

Somerset, WI 54025

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Nero, Adam P

Other Attorneys

Anderson, Karl E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Needham, Scott; Court Reporter: Kasten, Vicki G; Additional Text: 09:40 AM Apprs: CO: S. Needham, Rpr: V. Kasten, Clerk: K. Anderson, ADA: Brian Thomas Smestad apepared by video means, DF ATTY: Abrianna Dolfi (for 21CM574) and Attorney Adam Nero appeared by video means, DF: Steven Leroy Jacobs appeared from jail. INCLUDES 21CF675, 21FO324, 21TR2903, & 21TR2904 & 21CM574. Court reviews file. Atty. Dofli requests trial dates. ADA Smestad prefers 21CF675 to be tried first. Court instructs counsel to contact JA to schedule 2-day jury trial and FPT three weeks in advance of JT, FPT date will be cut-off for negotiations, 2 days needed to try 21CM574 also. All cases not scheduled for trial to be scheduled as status conferences to trail. Adjourned. kma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Needham, Scott; Court Reporter: Kasten, Vicki G; Additional Text: 11:04 AM Apprs: CO: S. Needham, Rpr: V. Kasten, Clerk: B Harris, . ADA: Brian Thomas Smestad appears via zoom, DF ATTY: Adam P Nero Includes 21CF675, 21FO324, 21TR2903, & 21TR2904 and Atty. Abrianna Dolfi for 21CM574. DF: Steven Leroy Jacobs appeared from jail. Atty. Nero states there was an offer rec'd from the State and would like to reschedule hearing. Atty. Nero approved to appear by zoom for next hearing. Bond contiunes. Adjourned 11:12 AM. Status conference scheduled for February 15, 2022 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on February 15, 2022 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Needham, Scott; Court Reporter: Kasten, Vicki G; Additional Text: 09:45 AM Apprs: CO: SRN, Rpr: Kasten, Clerk: K Kittel. ADA: Erica Ellenwood DF ATTY: Adam P Nero, Abrianna Dolfi on 21CM574 only. DF: Steven Leroy Jacobs appeared from jail. 21CF675, 21CM574, 21FO324, 21TR2903, 21TR2904 (All PTC). Atty Dolfi states there is an agreement on 21CM574. Atty Nero states that DE is I/C rather than on bond on the matters he represents, is hopeful for a global resolution. Court preserves Atty Nero's right to file any motions. Atty Nero approved by zoom if scheduling only. Adjourned at: 9:53 am Pre-trial conference scheduled for February 9, 2022 at 11:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on February 9, 2022 at 11:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Filed by Atty Nero. Re: Motion Deadline. km Per SRN, Time to file motions is suspended pending discovery request being fulfilled and blood results being obtained. JA cc'd DA & Atty Nero. js/km

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Needham, Scott; Court Reporter: Kasten, Vicki G; Additional Text: 10:16 AM Apprs: CO: S. Needham, Rpr: V. Kasten, Clerk: B Harris, ADA: Brian Thomas Smestad, DF ATTY: Adam P Nero via zoom for cases 21CF675 (ARGN), STC for 21FO324 , 21TR2903, 21TR2904 and Atty. Abrianna Dolfi in person for 21CM574 (STC). DF: Steven Leroy Jacobs appeared from jail. Court informs def of charges, possible penalties and rights. Def understands. Waives reading. NG to all charges. Waives speedy trial. State to provide discovery including any audio and video recordings within 10 days and motions are due 20 days. Adjourned 10:26 AM. bph Pre-trial conference scheduled for January 5, 2022 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.; Additional Text: 02:34 PM Court Commissioner: Tim Heckmann, Reporter: Tape, Clerk: K Kittel. ADA: Erica Ellenwood DF ATTY: Adam P Nero DF: Steven Leroy Jacobs appeared from jail. INCLUDES: 21CF675 (PH), 21FO324, 21TR2903, 21TR2904 (all set for STC). S/T Officer Jarid Kerber; Somerset PD; direct by Atty Ellenwood. Cross by Atty Nero. Attys argue bindover. Court finds probable cause that a felony was committed and the DF probably committed that felony and binds over for trial. Atty Nero would like to argue bond, asks that the bond be increased to $800. State does not object. Court modifies bond. Bond continues as modified. Atty Nero approved by zoom for ARGN. Adjourned at 3:02 pm. Arraignment scheduled for November 29, 2021 at 10:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on November 29, 2021 at 10:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.; Court Reporter: TAPE REPORTER; Additional Text: 11:04 AM FCC Crt Comm: Timothy C. Heckmann, RPR: Electronic Recorder, Clk: Harris, ADA: Brian Thomas Smestad, DF ATTY: Adam P Nero, DF: Steven Leroy Jacobs appeared. Includes 21CF675, 21FO324, 21TR2903, & 21TR2904. Court reviews case. Atty Nero has been retained, Court will schedule PH. TR & FO case to trail. Preliminary hearing scheduled for October 20, 2021 at 02:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: filed by Atty. Nero requesting to reschedule STC scheduled for 8/27/21. To SRN for review. Includes 21CF675, 21FO324, 21TR2903, & 21TR2904. bph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for State of Wisconsin; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for State of Wisconsin Current: (Effective: 08-18-2021) Prior: 115 Spring Street, PO Box 158, Somerset, WI 54025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $514.6; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: yes; Plate Number: LK3894; Expiration: 2022; VIN: 1GTEK19T33Z348121; Issuing Agency: Village of Somerset; Officer Name: Kerber, Jarid; Violation Date: 2021-08-15; Plaintiff Agency: State of Wisconsin; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 946.41; Charge Description: Knowingly give false info to officer 946.41; Severity: Forf. U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Initial appearance; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.; Court Reporter: Kasten, Vicki G; Additional Text: TO ALSO INCLUDE 21CF675, 21TR2903, 21TR2904 & 21FO324: Apprs: CO: TCH on behalf of S. Needham, Rpr: V. Kasten, Clerk: Liddle ADA: Brian Thomas Smestad and Martin Sanberg. DF ATTY: Jeremiah James Harrelson DF: Steven Leroy Jacobs appeared from jail. Steven Leroy Jacobs appeared by video means. DE does not qualify for PD services. Given PFAC. Address confirmed. DE has complaint. Court informs def of charges, possible penalties and rights. Def understands. Waives reading. Atty Harrelson argues amount of cash. Court will have civil matters trail and NG plea to 21TR2903, 21TR2904 & 21FO324. Status conference scheduled for August 27, 2021 at 10:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on August 27, 2021 at 10:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.; Court Reporter: Kasten, Vicki G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Not guilty plea; Court Official: Needham, Scott; Additional Text: Count 01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 946.41(1); Plea: Not Guilty on 2021-08-16; Description: Resisting or Obstructing an Officer (Forfeiture)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anderson, Karl E