This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 12/30/2022 at 17:10:16 (UTC).

State of Wisconsin vs. SASHA E LOTTS

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 State of Wisconsin filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against SASHA E LOTTS. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Lane, Benjamin J. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0891

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Lane, Benjamin J

 

Party Details

Defendants

LOTTS, SASHA E

LOTTS, SASHA ELIZABETH

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Matthews, Sara

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • HearingDescription: Initial appearance; Court Official: Lane, Benjamin J.; Location: Chippewa County Courthouse, Branch 3; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 46-1(aaa); Description: Disorderly Conduct - adopts 947.01 Wis. Stats.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthews, Sara