This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 22:54:53 (UTC).

State of Wisconsin vs. Russell Joseph Chamberlin

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 State of Wisconsin filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Russell Joseph Chamberlin. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Anderson, John P and Cederberg, Kay L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0133

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Anderson, John P

Cederberg, Kay L

 

Party Details

Defendant

Chamberlin, Russell Joseph

Crosby, MN 56441-1506

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Lawton, Kimberly

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to DNR of compliance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to DNR of non-compliance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BAYFIELD; Case number: 2021FO000133; Caption: State of Wisconsin vs. Russell Joseph Chamberlin; Total Amount: $269.08; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Russell Joseph Chamberlin; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 15 5Th St Ne, Crosby, MN 56441-1506; Judgment Party; Party Name: Bayfield County Clerk of Circuit Court; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $263.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Post-judgment interest; Amount: $0.93

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other; Amount: $263.5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: 30 Day SDC Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Nonmilitary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $264.43; Adjustments: $4.65; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $269.08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment of conviction; Court Official: Cederberg, Kay L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $100.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: yes; Plate Number: EZS701; Expiration: 2022; VIN: 1GCEK19T12E198743; Issuing Agency: State Patrol; Officer Name: Saraniecki, C; Violation Date: 2021-02-10; Plaintiff Agency: State of Wisconsin; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 961.573(1); Charge Description: Possess Drug Paraphernalia; Severity: Misd. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default Judgment; Additional Text: Minutes Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 11-1-1.3; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-03-16; Description: Possess Drug Paraphernalia; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-03-16; Ordered Date: 2021-03-16; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Anderson, John P.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine; Notes: Forfeiture of $263.50, to be paid in 60 days or arrange a payment plan through the Clerk of Courts office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawton, Kimberly