This case was last updated from Florence County Wisconsin Courts on 12/30/2022 at 17:15:14 (UTC).

State of Wisconsin vs. Robert C Hedmark

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 State of Wisconsin filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Robert C Hedmark. This case was filed in Florence County Wisconsin Courts, Florence County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Stenz, Leon D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0210

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Florence, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Stenz, Leon D

 

Party Details

Defendant

Hedmark, Robert C

Niagara, WI 54151

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketBond mount: $217.9; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Dept. of Natural Resources; Violation Date: 2022-11-20; Plaintiff Agency: State of Wisconsin; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 167.31(2)(d); Charge Description: Discharge Firearm From/Across Highway; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Stenz, Leon D.; Court Reporter: VanCleve, Jolene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Stenz, Leon D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Fine paid in full; Court Official: Stenz, Leon D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $217.9; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $217.9; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 167.31(2)(d); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2022-12-20; Description: Discharge Firearm From/Across Highway; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2022-12-20; Ordered Date: 2022-12-20; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Stenz, Leon D.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less