This case was last updated from Bayfield County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 21:54:09 (UTC).

State of Wisconsin vs. Patrick Allen Langer

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 State of Wisconsin filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Patrick Allen Langer. This case was filed in Bayfield County Courts, Bayfield County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, John P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0124

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Bayfield, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, John P

 

Party Details

Defendant

Langer, Patrick Allen

Bloomington, MN 55420

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Full satisfaction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Nonmilitary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: 30 Day SDC Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BAYFIELD; Case number: 2021FO000124; Caption: State of Wisconsin vs. Patrick Allen Langer; Total Amount: $232.0; Satisfaction: Full; Judgment Party; Party Name: Patrick Allen Langer; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 9319 1st Ave S, Bloomington, MN 55420; Judgment Party; Party Name: Bayfield County Clerk of Circuit Court; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $232.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-08-11; Type: Full satisfaction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other; Amount: $232.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to DNR of non-compliance; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $232.0; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Plate Number: JD3790; Expiration: 2021; Issuing Agency: Bayfield County Sheriff; Violation Date: 2021-02-27; Plaintiff Agency: State of Wisconsin; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 350.10(1)(c); Charge Description: Operate Snowmobile-Fail/Comply Signs; Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment entered; Court Official: Anderson, John P.; Court Reporter: Nordin, Denise D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Default Judgment; Court Official: Anderson, John P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $232.0; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $232.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 350.10(1)(c); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-04-19; Description: Operate Snowmobile-Fail/Comply Signs; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-04-19; Ordered Date: 2021-04-19; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Anderson, John P.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less