This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 07/12/2022 at 18:13:19 (UTC).

State of Wisconsin vs. Mai Moua Yang

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 State of Wisconsin filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Mai Moua Yang. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Gruber, William V and Weber, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0210

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Gruber, William V

Weber, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Defendant

Yang, Mai Moua

Milwaukee, WI 53209

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Check/Disbursement; Amount: $30.0; Additional Text: Overpayment refunded to Defendant. 22C 014158

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketBond mount: $222.9; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Dept. of Natural Resources; Violation Date: 2022-04-24; Plaintiff Agency: State of Wisconsin; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 29.055; Charge Description: Possession of Illegal Size Fish; Severity: Forf. U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Fine paid in full; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $252.9; Additional Text: 22R 010494

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certified mail service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Certified Mail Reciept

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of Dishonor mailed Certified to Payor; Re: Returned ACH Payment. ($222.90 - 5/16/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $252.9; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $252.9; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 29.055; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2022-06-14; Description: Possession of Illegal Size Fish; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2022-06-14; Ordered Date: 2022-06-14; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Weber, Jennifer; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    Read MoreRead Less