This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 14:00:29 (UTC).

State of Wisconsin vs. Lucas A Greeno

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 State of Wisconsin filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Lucas A Greeno. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Gonzalez, Ramona A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0208

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Gonzalez, Ramona A

 

Party Details

Defendant

Greeno, Lucas A

Onalaska, WI 54650

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketBond mount: $230.9; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Issuing Agency: Dept of Natural Resources; Violation Date: 2021-07-10; Plaintiff Agency: State of Wisconsin; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 29.024(1); Charge Description: Fish without License - R; Severity: Forf. U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Forfeiture; Court Official: Gonzalez, Ramona A.; Court Reporter: Frydenlund, Amy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Gonzalez, Ramona A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $230.9; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $230.9; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 29.024(1); Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-08-26; Description: Fish without License - R; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-08-26; Ordered Date: 2021-08-26; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Gonzalez, Ramona A.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine

    Read MoreRead Less